This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/24/2019 at 22:33:53 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL VS RUMBLE, ELIZABETH Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RUMBLE, ELIZABETH. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL

Defendants

RUMBLE, JAMES

RUMBLE, ELIZABETH

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANDERGRIFF, LEA W.

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

01/20/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

01/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

01/13/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

01/13/2020:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY IN FAVOR OF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION WITH NOTICE OF FILING IN FRONT OF ORDER

01/13/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM THE AUTOMATIC STAY IN FAVOR OF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NA FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION WITH NOTICE OF FILING IN FRONT OF ORDER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY NKA MATT RUMBLE

11/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY NKA MATT RUMBLE

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

01/20/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

01/13/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ELIZABETH RUMBLE

11/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ELIZABETH RUMBLE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

03/18/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES RUMBLE

11/04/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES RUMBLE

ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

04/01/2020:ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFTS JAMES WILLIAM RUMBLE AND ELIZABETH ANN RUMBLE

10/25/2019:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFTS JAMES WILLIAM RUMBLE AND ELIZABETH ANN RUMBLE

NOTICE OF FILING

10/01/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/01/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/01/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Payment received: $935.00 Receipt Number XX 470305

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA002186CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vandergriff, Lea W.