This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/08/2019 at 22:32:38 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL A VS STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL A

Defendants

THOMAS, JOHN AARON

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEE

THOMAS, ALEXIS PAIGE

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

THOMAS, SAMUEL

Not Classified By Court

AKA ALEXIS PAIGE GARLAND

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTH

AND ALL OTHER PERSONS CLAIMING

CREDITORS LIENORS AND TRUSTEES

IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PART

A MINOR,

SPOUSE HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES

SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM

UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NA

GARLAND, ALEXIS PAIGE

UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN I

AGAINST THE NAMED DEFENDANT S

SAMUEL THOMAS A MINOR,

ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR AL

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEXIS PAIGE THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN AARON THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ALEXIS PAIGE THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SAMUEL THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JOHN AARON THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWNM PARTIES IN POSSESSION 2

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2019
View Court Documents

DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019

DocketPayment received: $995.00 Receipt Number XX 474424

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $995.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2019

DocketCase 422019CA002287CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/15/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less