This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/04/2022 at 22:33:36 (UTC).

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION VS JAMES, DARRELL LEVERN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMES, DARRELL LEVERN. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION

Defendants

JAMES, DARRELL LEVERN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARRELL LEVE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING I

Not Classified By Court

UNDER OR AGAINST A NAMED DEFEN

OR HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE

INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

ROOKS, ASHTON

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/10/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

06/23/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

06/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

06/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

06/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

06/20/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

06/10/2022:CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

06/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

06/10/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

06/10/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY DEFT DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DARRELL LEVERN JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 753264

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001169CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rooks, Ashton