This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/14/2020 at 19:41:38 (UTC).

JOHNSON, KRISTINE VS JOHNSON, MATTHEW A

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 JOHNSON, KRISTINE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against JOHNSON, MATTHEW A. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA and ANN CRAGGS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

ANN CRAGGS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOHNSON, KRISTINE

Respondent

JOHNSON, MATTHEW A

Not Classified By Court

CIMIOTTA, KRISTINE NOEL

BURCH, KRISTINE

JOHNSON, MATTHEW ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HARRIS, CARLEAN JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCLS:FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEVIDENCE LIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE OBO PETITONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketSHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE - TRO SERVED ON 02/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketActive Process DOMESTIC VIOLENCE disposition on 02/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketTEMP INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HRG scheduled on 02/20/2020 at 0830 AM - Judge ANN CRAGGS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FOR SERVING RSPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR000542DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 02/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketJudge: CRAGGS , ANN MELINDA assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS, CARLEAN JONES