This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 07/04/2019 at 21:31:43 (UTC).

JOEBED INVESTMENTS LLC VS MAECHTLE, GREG Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 JOEBED INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAECHTLE, GREG. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOEBED INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

MAECHTLE, GREG

MAECHTLE, SANDRA

 

Court Documents

ORDER REQUIRING-DEFTS/TENANTS TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY

07/02/2019:ORDER REQUIRING-DEFTS/TENANTS TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY PAID BY DEFGREG MAECHTLE

07/02/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY PAID BY DEFGREG MAECHTLE

JUDGES WORKSHEET

07/01/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/21/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

06/19/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT GREG MAECHTLE

06/19/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT GREG MAECHTLE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/11/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

06/10/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- PROCESS SERVER/ EMAIL

06/10/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- PROCESS SERVER/ EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

06/10/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

06/10/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

06/10/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/10/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER REQUIRING-DEFTS/TENANTS TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO THE COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY PAID BY DEFGREG MAECHTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment received: $700.00 Receipt Number XX 444217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 8 assessed at sum $17.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 7 assessed at sum $682.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Assessment 6 assessed at sum $682.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT GREG MAECHTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 437876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Case 422019SC002833SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less