This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/05/2019 at 21:31:12 (UTC).

JOE C BROWN TRUSTEE VS ALL OCCUPANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 JOE C BROWN TRUSTEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOE C BROWN TRUSTEE

Defendants

ALL OCCUPANTS

HALL, HUGH

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

04/30/2019:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER DENYING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

04/24/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/24/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT

04/24/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

04/24/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

04/24/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

04/24/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT HUGH HALL

04/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT HUGH HALL

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

04/12/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

04/11/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

04/11/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

04/11/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/12/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

04/11/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/11/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION PLTFS MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT HUGH HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Payment received: $219.00 Receipt Number XX 420217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Case 422019SC001908SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 04/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less