This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 21:22:19 (UTC).

JLC CAPITAL FUNDING LLC VS NAME CONFIDENTIAL (PER FS 119.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 JLC CAPITAL FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NAME CONFIDENTIAL PER FS 119. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JLC CAPITAL FUNDING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RILLING, RICHARD JAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS FILED BY PLTF

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

11/04/2022:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING - UNDER REVIEW PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/10/2022:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY JCL CAPITAL FUNDING LLC

01/05/2023:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY JCL CAPITAL FUNDING LLC

 

Docket Entries

01/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY JCL CAPITAL FUNDING LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 795538

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION -PETITION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION-MOTION TO DETERMINE CONFIDENTIALITY OF COURT RECORDS FILED BY PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . MotionToTreatAsConfidential

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002331CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less