This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 21:32:29 (UTC).

JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC VS GADSDEN, JANAY MARCIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GADSDEN, JANAY MARCIA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

GADSDEN, JANAY MARCIA

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

10/08/2020:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

10/08/2020:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

DEFAULT ENTERED

10/08/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/07/2020:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/29/2020:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

09/25/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANAY MARCIA GADSDEN

09/25/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANAY MARCIA GADSDEN

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FJ OF EVICTION FILED BY PLNTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JANAY MARCIA GADSDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 566078

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC003093SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less