This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:46:55 (UTC).

JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC VS ALLARD, JOSHUA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLARD, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC

Defendants

MARTINEZ, KIMBERLY

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

ALLARD, JOSHUA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT JOSHUA ALLARD

03/19/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT JOSHUA ALLARD

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/04/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

02/28/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

CLS: ORDER

02/28/2019:CLS: ORDER

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/19/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC

02/19/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/19/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

02/18/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KIMBERLY MARTINEZ

01/28/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KIMBERLY MARTINEZ

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR JOSHUA ALLARD

01/28/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR JOSHUA ALLARD

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/18/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/18/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/18/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/18/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT JOSHUA ALLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION FILED BY PLTF JAKTHAN PROPERTIES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR KIMBERLY MARTINEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR JOSHUA ALLARD

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 393530

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Case 422019SC000254SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less