This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/02/2019 at 22:30:14 (UTC).

JACKSON, RACHAEL VS LOOPSTERS TOWING AND COLLISION Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 JACKSON, RACHAEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOOPSTERS TOWING AND COLLISION. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSON, RACHAEL

Defendants

LOOPSTERS TOWING AND COLLISION

MOREY, DERRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RACHAEL JACKSON

04/13/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RACHAEL JACKSON

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTERS TOWING AND COLLISION INC

06/12/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY DEFT DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTERS TOWING AND COLLISION INC

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISION INC

04/27/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISION INC

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

04/13/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RACHAEL JACKSON

04/13/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RACHAEL JACKSON

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

04/08/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

04/10/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISON INC

04/28/2020:CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION FILED BY DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISON INC

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF RACHAEL JACKSON FILED PER DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISON INC

05/19/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF RACHAEL JACKSON FILED PER DEFTS DERRICK MOREY AND LOOPSTER TOWING AND COLLISON INC

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS

11/04/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS

11/04/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DERRICK MOREY

10/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DERRICK MOREY

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/09/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

EFILED SUMMONS

10/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DERRICK MOREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 473004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case 422019CA002246CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less