This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2022 at 22:16:44 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA VS BROWN, DEBORAH D Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 HSBC BANK USA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BROWN, DEBORAH D. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Defendants

BROWN, DEBORAH D

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEBORAH D BR

IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PART

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

CITY OF OCALA

Not Classified By Court

NATIONAL ASSOCIATION IN ITS CA

FOR THE CITIGROUP MORTGAGE LOA

ASSET BACKED PASS THROUGH CERT

SHL 1

THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST THE A

DEFENDANTS WHO ARE NOT KNOWN T

WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES M

AS SPOUSES HEIRS DEVISEES GRAN

LEINORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR

CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR A

NAMED DEFENDANTS

SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO FIRST N

A MUNICIPAL CORPORATION OF THE

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

NEUMAN, ROD BARRETT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/05/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/01/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

12/01/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

12/01/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

12/01/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATION

12/01/2022:CERTIFICATION

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/01/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $977.50 Receipt Number XX 802635

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $977.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002522CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less