This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/28/2022 at 22:37:15 (UTC).

HOWANITZ, MARIANNE VS BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 HOWANITZ, MARIANNE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWANITZ, MARIANNE

Defendant

BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

PA,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOGGS, AMY DERUELLE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/04/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

04/04/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

04/12/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/04/2022:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

05/04/2022:EFILED UNSIGNED DEFAULT

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLFT MARIANNE HOWANITZ

05/04/2022:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLFT MARIANNE HOWANITZ

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/06/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

05/10/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION UNOPPOSED TO SET ASIDE CLERK DEFAULT

05/11/2022:MOTION UNOPPOSED TO SET ASIDE CLERK DEFAULT

AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK DEFAULT

05/12/2022:AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFTS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK DEFAULT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

05/26/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MARIANNE HOWANITZ

05/31/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MARIANNE HOWANITZ

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MARIANNE HOWANITZ

05/31/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MARIANNE HOWANITZ

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 732204

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000630CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where P A is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY D BOGGS