This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/22/2019 at 21:31:15 (UTC).

HOME PARK, VICTORY MOBILE VS BROWN, CAMELLA

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 HOME PARK, VICTORY MOBILE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, CAMELLA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOME PARK, VICTORY MOBILE

Defendant

BROWN, CAMELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGINS, DANIALLE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/21/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

06/19/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/14/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFT FILED BY PLTF VICTORY MOBILE HOME PARK

06/14/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFT FILED BY PLTF VICTORY MOBILE HOME PARK

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/14/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/12/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/04/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CAMELLA BROWN

06/03/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CAMELLA BROWN

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/29/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/29/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/29/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE PLTFS COMPLAINT AND ORDER OF POSSESSION AS TO DEFT FILED BY PLTF VICTORY MOBILE HOME PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CAMELLA BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 433940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Case 422019SC002700SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less