Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 04/20/2021 at 22:03:29 (UTC).

HENDERSON, KIMBERLY VS FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 HENDERSON, KIMBERLY filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENDERSON, KIMBERLY

Defendant

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARCILA, BRYAN

 

Court Documents

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF KIMBERLY HENDERSON

04/16/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF KIMBERLY HENDERSON

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE

04/14/2021:NOTICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/14/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/14/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/14/2021:ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/14/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

04/14/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF KIMBERLY HENDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 628264

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000690CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARCILA, BRYAN