This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/19/2019 at 22:31:50 (UTC).

HARVEY, BYRAN L VS CLARK, TERRANCE EUGENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 HARVEY, BYRAN L filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLARK, TERRANCE EUGENE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARVEY, BYRAN L

Defendants

GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LL

CLARK, TERRANCE EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

07/07/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS

05/21/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF BYRAN L HARVEY

05/28/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO COUNSEL FILED BY PLTF BYRAN L HARVEY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

07/07/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

10/01/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

05/09/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/25/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/25/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/25/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/25/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS

04/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/25/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/25/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/25/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT GAMETIME LAWN AND LANDSCAPE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 424370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case 422019CA000918CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less