This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/09/2019 at 22:31:35 (UTC).

HALL, KEITH Et Al VS COLLINS, KEITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 HALL, KEITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COLLINS, KEITH. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HALL, SUE

HALL, KEITH

Defendants

COLLINS, KEITH

KNIGHT REFRIDGERATED LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONNY ALLEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/06/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/06/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/06/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/06/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/06/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/06/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/06/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/06/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/16/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 481292

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 474969

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Case 422019CA002292CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less