Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:05:59 (UTC).

HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION VS BURKE, GEORGIA L Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BURKE, GEORGIA L. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION

Defendants

MARION COUNTY

LIMBAUGH, JULIE

CITY OF DUNNELLON FLORIDA

BURKE, GEORGIA L

Not Classified By Court

LIMBAUGH BURNS, JULIE

LIMBAUGH, JULIE L

A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF MAR

FKA HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF GR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACKERMAN, BRYCE W

 

Court Documents

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/06/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IND. GEORGIA L BURKE

12/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IND. GEORGIA L BURKE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION COUNTY INC

04/29/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLTF HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION COUNTY INC

DEFAULT ENTERED

12/16/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION-MOTION FILED BY DEFT JULIE LIMBAUGH

11/25/2019:MOTION-MOTION FILED BY DEFT JULIE LIMBAUGH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION COUNTY

11/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MARION COUNTY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CITY OF DUNNELLON

11/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CITY OF DUNNELLON

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JULIE LIMBAUGH

11/15/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JULIE LIMBAUGH

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/15/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT THE CITY OF DUNNELLON FLORIDA

11/15/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT THE CITY OF DUNNELLON FLORIDA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT CITY OF DUNNELLON FLORIDA

11/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT CITY OF DUNNELLON FLORIDA

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY

11/15/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MARION COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

LENDER INFORMATION SHEET

11/01/2019:LENDER INFORMATION SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/01/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/01/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS FILED BY PTF HABITAT FOR HUMANITY OF MARION COUNTY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LENDER INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Payment received: $947.50 Receipt Number XX 479822

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $947.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA002415CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marion County is a litigant