This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/17/2021 at 22:36:29 (UTC).

GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPO VS GEISSLER, MELISSA JANE Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GEISSLER, MELISSA JANE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULF HARBOUR INVESTMENTS CORPO

Defendants

GEISSLER, MELISSA JANE

UNDERHILL, DANIEL GEORGE

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MELISSA JANE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DANIEL GEORG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS, SARA BETH

 

Court Documents

EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

09/29/2021:EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

09/29/2021:EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

09/29/2021:EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/27/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

09/23/2021:NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE

09/23/2021:NOTICE

NOTICE

09/23/2021:NOTICE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $462.50 Receipt Number XX 676244

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $462.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001764CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ