This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/07/2020 at 22:31:17 (UTC).

GROSZ, NATALIE E VS ELLSPERMANN, DAVID R Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 GROSZ, NATALIE E filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ELLSPERMANN, DAVID R. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROSZ, NATALIE E

Defendants

ERNEST, KIMBERLEY DAWN

ELLSPERMANN, DAVID R

ERNEST, KEVIN WILLIAM

ANY UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESS

Not Classified By Court

CLERK OF COURT, MARION COUNTY,

GROSS, NKA KIMBERLY DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRENTELMAN, JOHN CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFT DAVID R ELLSPERMANN AS CLERK OF COURT MARION COUNTY FL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KEVIN WILLIAMS ERNEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KIMBERLY DAWN ERNEST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT DAVID R ELLSPERMANN AS CLERK OF COURT MARION COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $440.00 Receipt Number XX 582707

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLENDER INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION AS TO PROMISSORY NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001821CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/13/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less