This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/16/2019 at 21:32:44 (UTC).

GOMEZ SOLANO, LUZ M VS BELL, COLEMAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 GOMEZ SOLANO, LUZ M filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BELL, COLEMAN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ SOLANO, LUZ M

Defendants

BUNCH, WALTER GERMAIN

BELL, ROSHUNTA

BUNCH, WALTER

BELL, COLEMAN

BELL, VERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY, JERRON LEON

 

Court Documents

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION

06/13/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/07/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

06/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

06/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER BUNCH

06/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER BUNCH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VERA BELL

06/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VERA BELL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COLEMAN BELL

06/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COLEMAN BELL

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSHUNTA BELL

06/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSHUNTA BELL

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

06/06/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/28/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/24/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/24/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/24/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF LUZ M GOMEZ SOLANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WALTER BUNCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR VERA BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR COLEMAN BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSHUNTA BELL

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Payment received: $225.00 Receipt Number XX 433178

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case 422019SC002662SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less