This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/03/2021 at 22:33:00 (UTC).

GOMEZ, BERNARDO VS HOME DEPOT USA INC

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 GOMEZ, BERNARDO filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HOME DEPOT USA INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ, BERNARDO

Defendant

HOME DEPOT USA INC

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOUGLAS, CHARLES T

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

09/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

09/22/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON HOME DEPOT USA INC ON SEPT 15 2021

09/22/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON HOME DEPOT USA INC ON SEPT 15 2021

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/13/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/09/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/09/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/09/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY BERNARDO GOMEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON HOME DEPOT USA INC ON SEPT 15 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 671833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001659CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLAS, CHARLES T