This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/14/2020 at 22:35:39 (UTC).

GILES, JANE E VS MACKAY, RAYMOND I

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 GILES, JANE E filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MACKAY, RAYMOND I. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILES, JANE E

Defendant

MACKAY, RAYMOND I

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALL, DAVID ALAN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/21/2020:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/21/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/21/2020:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 566286

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CA001530CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less