This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/25/2019 at 22:30:50 (UTC).

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY VS REAVES, ZARKIYA PAULINE

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against REAVES, ZARKIYA PAULINE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendant

REAVES, ZARKIYA PAULINE

Not Classified By Court

AS SUBROGEE OF ANGELA GRAHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHILLER, BRUCE HOWARD

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

09/30/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

09/23/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

02/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

MOTION-MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

02/21/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

02/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

02/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

09/23/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ZARKIYA PAULINE REAVES

08/03/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ZARKIYA PAULINE REAVES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ZARKIYA PAULINE REAVES

07/08/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ZARKIYA PAULINE REAVES

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

03/04/2020:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 426013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA000954CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less