This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/18/2023 at 20:57:10 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN VS KING, ALBERTHA DENISE Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KING, ALBERTHA DENISE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

Defendants

KING, ALBERTHA DENISE

KING, LATOYA CHANTRELL

Not Classified By Court

AS SUBROGEE OF ZONA R HODGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REISS, JENNIFER L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/04/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

11/04/2022:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION- MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF GEICO

11/23/2022:MOTION- MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF GEICO

CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

12/07/2022:CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/06/2023:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

01/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF GEICO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketPayment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 795192

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2022

DocketCase 422022CA002319CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less