Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/30/2019 at 22:31:18 (UTC).

FOSBINDER, JOHN DAVID Et Al VS BROEHM, KEVIN JASON Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 FOSBINDER, JOHN DAVID filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BROEHM, KEVIN JASON. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORMAN, KAY

FOSBINDER, JOHN DAVID

Defendants

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR

STATE OF FLORIDA

CALABRIA, FRANK LEWIS

BROEHM, KEVIN JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, ROBERT DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

OLIVER, ERIN ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE OF STATE OF FLORIDA

12/23/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE OF STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT KEVIN JASON BROEHM

12/26/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT KEVIN JASON BROEHM

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT DAVID R ELLSPERMANN CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

11/26/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT DAVID R ELLSPERMANN CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

MOTION-MOTION FILED BY FRANK CALABRIA

12/02/2019:MOTION-MOTION FILED BY FRANK CALABRIA

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/03/2020:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/03/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

ANSWER FILED BY DEFT KEVIN JASON BROEHM

02/24/2020:ANSWER FILED BY DEFT KEVIN JASON BROEHM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KEVIN JASON BROEHM

02/06/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KEVIN JASON BROEHM

RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT FRANK CALABRIA

02/26/2020:RESPONSE FILED BY DEFT FRANK CALABRIA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FRANK LEWIS CALABRIA

11/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FRANK LEWIS CALABRIA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVID R ELLSPERMANN

11/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVID R ELLSPERMANN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA

11/22/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA

NOTICE

11/20/2019:NOTICE

EFILED SUMMONS

11/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/06/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

11/06/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/06/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FRANK LEWIS CALABRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVID R ELLSPERMANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 481147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002438CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clerk fo Circuit Court of Broward County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLIVER ERIN E