This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/18/2019 at 22:32:01 (UTC).

FORT, RICHARD G VS YOUNG, DEANNA MARIE LANIER

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 FORT, RICHARD G filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YOUNG, DEANNA MARIE LANIER. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORT, RICHARD G

Defendant

YOUNG, DEANNA MARIE LANIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

12/31/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G FORT

01/07/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G FORT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

01/14/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

05/20/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

05/20/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

05/20/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG

08/12/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G FORT

08/21/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G FORT

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

05/20/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

05/20/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT DEANNA YOUNG

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G. FORT

01/02/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G. FORT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFENDANT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG

01/03/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFENDANT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G. FORT

01/03/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF RICHARD G. FORT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

05/07/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/24/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/24/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/24/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT DEANNA MARIE LANIER YOUNG BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 423995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Case 422019CA000907CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less