This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/14/2020 at 21:33:46 (UTC).

FISHEATING CREEK TRUST VS DEMAIO, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 FISHEATING CREEK TRUST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEMAIO, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FISHEATING CREEK TRUST

Defendant

DEMAIO, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

AND ALL OCCUPANTS,

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

08/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

08/21/2020:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

08/21/2020:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

08/21/2020:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

08/21/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

08/21/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

08/21/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/21/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

08/21/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

08/28/2020:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MIKE DEMAIO AND SAMANTHA MARVIN

09/03/2020:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MIKE DEMAIO AND SAMANTHA MARVIN

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

09/03/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

MOTION- MOTION FOR COURT TO DETERMINE AMOUNT FOR RENT FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

09/03/2020:MOTION- MOTION FOR COURT TO DETERMINE AMOUNT FOR RENT FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

09/10/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

09/10/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF FISHEATING CREEK TRUST

09/21/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF FISHEATING CREEK TRUST

JUDGES WORKSHEET

09/21/2020:JUDGES WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

09/14/2020:NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR COURT TO DETERMINE AMOUNT FOR RENT FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT MIKE DEMAIO AND SAMANTHA MARVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT MICHAEL DEMAIO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 08/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT-FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $206.15 Receipt Number XX 557852

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $0.15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC002744SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 08/21/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less