This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/01/2022 at 22:34:47 (UTC).

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC VS FRETT, DALE E Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FRETT, DALE E. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCE OF AMERICA REVERSE LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

HILLARY, DORAIN

FRETT, DALE E

UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Not Classified By Court

ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRET

URBAN DEVELOPMENT

CO SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THE HE

REVOCABLE TRUST DATED MAY 23 2

OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

BORZILLO, CINDY WOLPER

 

Court Documents

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/06/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED LIS PENDENS

06/07/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF FILING

06/07/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/07/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

06/07/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED SUMMONS

06/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/07/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $945.00 Receipt Number XX 751472

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001131CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY 1 is a litigant

Latest cases where URBAN DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ACTING TRUSTEE OF THE NORMAN RICHARD MICHAELSON TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where REVOCABLE TRUST is a litigant