This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/18/2021 at 19:25:21 (UTC).

FIFTH THIRD BANK VS KIPP, BRIAN RICHARD Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 FIFTH THIRD BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KIPP, BRIAN RICHARD. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Defendants

SCOTT SMITH ROOFING INC

KIPP, ROBERT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KIM KIPP

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRIAN RICHAR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KEVIN DALE K

KIPP, KIM

KIPP, KEVIN DALE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 2

KIPP, KELLE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KELLE KIPP

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION 1

Not Classified By Court

AKA BRIAN KIPP,

AKA ROBERT DALE KIPP,

AKA ROBERT DALE KIPP

AKA KELLE JAMES

INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

AKA KIMBERLE K LOOKINGBILL,

AKA KIM LOOKINGBILL,

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

COLLINS, SARA BETH

HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED

10/22/2021:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PURCHASERS ATTORNEY

10/07/2021:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE TO PURCHASERS ATTORNEY

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

10/07/2021:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

COPY OF: ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/06/2021:COPY OF: ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

10/01/2021:ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY BUYER

07/23/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY BUYER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY BUYER

07/23/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY BUYER

MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BUYER

07/23/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY BUYER

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PURCHASER SECRETARY OF VETERAN AFFAIRS

07/15/2021:AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE FILED BY PURCHASER SECRETARY OF VETERAN AFFAIRS

116 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 03/08/2021 11:00; Judge: APPLICABLE, NOT; Docket Type: RESET FCLSR SALE; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER TO BE; Defendant Attorney: HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAssessment 6 assessed at sum $1,085.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $140.00 Receipt Number XX 603460

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED NOTICE OF SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $140.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF: ORDER ON EMERGENCY MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESET SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent RESET FCLSR SALE scheduled on 03/08/2021 at 1100 AM - Judge NOT APPLICABLE presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketReopen CIVIL OTHER closed on 01/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,105.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA000384CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Internal Revenue Service is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARA B COLLINS, ESQ