This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/14/2020 at 18:36:53 (UTC).

ELIAS, CARLOS A VS MOLINA, NORMA H

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 ELIAS, CARLOS A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOLINA, NORMA H. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELIAS, CARLOS A

Respondent

MOLINA, NORMA H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $8.00 Receipt Number XX 547406

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $8.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCLS: JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING ELECTRONIC HEARING ON 7/7/20 AT 1015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION- FOR FINAL HEARING - CARLOS ELIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST NORMA MOLINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT - CARLOS ELIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketSHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE- SERVED NORMA MOLINA ON 2/5/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY ORDER NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INDIGENCY APPROVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO NORNA MOLINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DOM WITH NO MINOR CHILDREN OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR000422DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 02/03/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less