This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/25/2019 at 22:32:23 (UTC).

DYOUS, EARTHA MARIE VS HUTCHESON, JASON TYLER

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 DYOUS, EARTHA MARIE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUTCHESON, JASON TYLER. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYOUS, EARTHA MARIE

Defendant

HUTCHESON, JASON TYLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UDELL, HARRAN ERIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/24/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

06/26/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

06/26/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

06/21/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED TO PLAINTIFF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

09/06/2019:ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED TO PLAINTIFF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

ORDER-FINAL ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLTF'S RESPONSES

09/06/2019:ORDER-FINAL ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLTF'S RESPONSES

STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLTFS RESPOSNES

08/30/2019:STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLTFS RESPOSNES

MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

08/02/2019:MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY FILED BY DEFT JASON TYLER HUTCHESON

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

03/13/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

09/12/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

09/12/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

06/19/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

06/19/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF EARTHA MARIE DYOUS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

05/01/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/01/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/01/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 426022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA000957CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less