This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:57:35 (UTC).

D&S HOLDINGS OF OCALA LLC Et Al VS ALEWINE, CARL JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 D S HOLDINGS OF OCALA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEWINE, CARL JR. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIASSON, SANDRA

D&S HOLDINGS OF OCALA LLC

Defendants

ALEWINE, CARL JR

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

02/07/2019:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

01/31/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CARL ALEWINE JR

01/31/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CARL ALEWINE JR

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES- SUMMONS

01/24/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES- SUMMONS

AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/24/2019:AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

01/24/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/23/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET-EMAIL

01/23/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET-EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

01/23/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

01/23/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/23/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CARL ALEWINE JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES- SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Payment received: $34.00 Receipt Number XX 395226

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 7 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Assessment 6 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Payment received: $17.00 Receipt Number XX 394995

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 5 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 394983

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case 422019SC000338SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less