This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/20/2019 at 22:30:54 (UTC).

DOUGLAS, SHEQUITA E VS ROBINSON, IVAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 DOUGLAS, SHEQUITA E filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBINSON, IVAN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOUGLAS, SHEQUITA E

Defendants

ROBINSON, PATTY

ROBINSON, IVAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

06/05/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

05/29/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

06/20/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

06/05/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

05/24/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

05/24/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

05/24/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

05/24/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

08/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT IVAN ROBINSON

07/18/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT IVAN ROBINSON

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT IVAN ROBINSON

07/18/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT IVAN ROBINSON

REQUEST FOR REPORT OF EXAMINER FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

02/18/2020:REQUEST FOR REPORT OF EXAMINER FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

OBJECTIONS DEFTS REQUEST FOR PLTF TO SUBMIT TO EXAMINATION AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE AT EXAMINATION FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

02/18/2020:OBJECTIONS DEFTS REQUEST FOR PLTF TO SUBMIT TO EXAMINATION AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE AT EXAMINATION FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

01/31/2020:REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFTS IVAN ROBINSON AND PATTY ROBINSON

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

12/17/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF SHEQUITA E DOUGLAS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

12/17/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

12/03/2019:ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

STIPULATION FOR TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

12/02/2019:STIPULATION FOR TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT IVAN ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT PATTY ROBINSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 424738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Case 422019CA000926CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less