This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 09/08/2022 at 21:34:05 (UTC).

DOUD, CANDY Et Al VS ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 DOUD, CANDY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOUD, CANDY

DOUD, JACOB

Defendants

HAMDEN, MAZEN

HAMDEN, CLARLINDA

HAMDEN, JAMAL

ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOTTLIEB, BRIAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/02/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS MAZEN HAMDEN CLARLINDA HAMDEN AND JAMAL HAMDEN

09/02/2022:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS MAZEN HAMDEN CLARLINDA HAMDEN AND JAMAL HAMDEN

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

09/01/2022:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

MOTION- AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

08/31/2022:MOTION- AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

08/30/2022:MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CLARLINDA HAMDEN

08/30/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CLARLINDA HAMDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MAZEN HAMDEN

08/30/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MAZEN HAMDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

08/30/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JAMAL HAMDEN

08/30/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JAMAL HAMDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

08/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MAZEN HAMDEN

08/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MAZEN HAMDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JAMAL HAMDEN

08/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JAMAL HAMDEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CLARLINDA HAMDEN

08/26/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CLARLINDA HAMDEN

EXHIBIT FILED BY DEFT

08/23/2022:EXHIBIT FILED BY DEFT

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS MAZEN HAMDEN JAMAL HAMDEN AND CLARLINDA HAMDEN ALL OTHERS

08/22/2022:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS MAZEN HAMDEN JAMAL HAMDEN AND CLARLINDA HAMDEN ALL OTHERS

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS MAZEN HAMDEN CLARLINDA HAMDEN AND JAMAL HAMDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING ANSWER AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CANDY AND JACOB DOUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT CLARLINDA HAMDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT MAZEN HAMDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JAMAL HAMDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT ALL UNKNOWN TENANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $225.00 Receipt Number XX 771483

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCase 422022SC003605SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gottlieb, Brian D