This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/07/2021 at 22:31:46 (UTC).

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC VS UNKNOWN TENANT 1 Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN TENANT 1. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC

Defendants

WEEKLEY, RANDALL E

WEEKLEY, DEBRA A

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNTER, TENIA CHIMERE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/16/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

09/16/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

09/16/2021:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/16/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/16/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/16/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/16/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/16/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $1,945.00 Receipt Number XX 674295

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,945.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001711CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tenia C Hunter Esq