This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/28/2019 at 23:30:45 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS RYDER, GERALD C

Case Summary

On 04/04/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against RYDER, GERALD C. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RYDER, GERALD C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN, NATAIJA JOYCE

 

Court Documents

EFILED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

11/25/2019:EFILED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

REO: MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT

11/25/2019:REO: MOTION FOR GARNISHMENT

REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

10/22/2019:REQUEST FOR COPIES COMPLETED

NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFTS FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

12/19/2019:NOTICE TO INDIVIDUAL DEFTS FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

SATISFACTION OF GARNISHMENT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

02/10/2020:SATISFACTION OF GARNISHMENT FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

GARNISHMENT FINAL JUDGMENT

01/15/2020:GARNISHMENT FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

01/15/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SERVED RE FLORIDA CREDIT UNION

12/19/2019:WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SERVED RE FLORIDA CREDIT UNION

MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

01/03/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

07/11/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

07/22/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/28/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

07/11/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DISCOVER BANK

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GERALD C RYDER

04/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GERALD C RYDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/04/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/04/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/04/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GERALD C RYDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 417501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Case 422019CC000402CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less