This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 08/24/2019 at 22:31:27 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AM VS KURZHALS, DARLENE Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2019 DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AM filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against KURZHALS, DARLENE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT W and HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT W

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AM

Defendants

KURZHALS, DARLENE

KURZHALS, FREDERIC

Not Classified By Court

HOMME EQUITY MORTGAGE ASSET BA

KURHALS, FREDERIC M

FORMERLY KNOWN AS BANKERS TRUS

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2001 KS3

AS TRUSTEE FOR RESIDENTIAL ASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLARFIELD, STEVEN JAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/31/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF FILING

07/31/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/31/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/31/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARLENE KURZHALS

08/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARLENE KURZHALS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR FREDERIC KURZHALS

08/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR FREDERIC KURZHALS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR FREDERIC KURZHALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DARLENE KURZHALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Payment received: $925.00 Receipt Number XX 452498

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $925.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Case 422019CA001728CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less