Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:05:44 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS FLORIDA CREDIT UNION Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FLORIDA CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

PACHECO, ALEX

MARTINEZ, YVETTE PACHECO

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF YVETTE PACHE

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF ALEX PACHECO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF YVETTE PACHE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ALEX PACHECO

FLORIDA CREDIT UNION

Not Classified By Court

AKA ALEX PECHECO

MARTINEZ, YVETTE

AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 200

MARTINEZ, YVETTE PACHECI

AKA YVETTE PACHECI MARTINEZ AK

THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 20

PECHECO, ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANNESS, JOHN ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

03/21/2020:AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVITS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

09/04/2020:NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED AFFIDAVITS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED ON APRIL 2,2020

05/06/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED ON APRIL 2,2020

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

01/30/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

03/05/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

02/25/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

01/06/2020:AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT

ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

02/25/2020:ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

REPLY

02/14/2020:REPLY

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/17/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

02/24/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

02/24/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

01/08/2020:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

02/24/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEYS FEE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE

MOTION-MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

03/05/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

03/05/2020:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT YVETTE PACHECO MARTINEZ

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/31/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

10/31/2019:CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Payment received: $960.00 Receipt Number XX 479391

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $960.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Case 422019CA002409CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AS TRUSTEE FOR GSAMP TRUST 200 is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant