This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/13/2020 at 12:11:08 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS CURRISON, KATHRYN A Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CURRISON, KATHRYN A. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

ROPER, ROBERT JEFFREY

CURRISON, KATHRYN A

Not Classified By Court

SONDERVAN, KATHRYN A

JOSLYN, KATHRYN A

PASS THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERI

JOSLYN, KATHRYN ANN

CURRISON, KATHRYN ANN

SONDERVAN, KATHRYN ANN

JOSLYN, KATHRYN

AS TRUSTEE FOR ARGENT SECURITI

SONDERVAN, KATHRYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GONZALEZ, MIGUEL ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING

12/06/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

12/06/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

06/26/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

06/26/2020:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/15/2020:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

06/16/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

EFILED LIS PENDENS

12/06/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/06/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DUE TO COVID 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS DUE TO COVID 19 FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR ROBERT JEFFREY ROPER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $925.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002664CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less