This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 09/23/2021 at 07:32:26 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C VS COVER, NOVLETTE V Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COVER, NOVLETTE. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST C

Defendants

THE MARION OAKS CIVIC ASSOCIAT

COVER, NOVLETTE V

COVER, VIVIAN S

Not Classified By Court

ASSET BACKED CERTIFICATES SERI

AS TRUSTEE FOR SOUNDVIEW HOME

INCORPORATED

TRUST SERIES 2006 A7CB MORTGAG

CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006 G

AS TRUSTEE FOR RESIDENTIAL ASS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCLAIN, ROBERT A

SPANOLIOS, JAMES JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

09/20/2021:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVERS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL

09/14/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVERS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE AMENDED TO DEFT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVER MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

09/10/2021:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE AMENDED TO DEFT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVER MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

ANSWER TO PLTFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

09/10/2021:ANSWER TO PLTFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

09/03/2021:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

ORDER TO RESPOND

09/01/2021:ORDER TO RESPOND

INVOICE-APPELLATE FEES

09/01/2021:INVOICE-APPELLATE FEES

ORDER-ORDER FROM 5TH DCA-MOTION TO RELINQUISH JURISDICTION IS GRANTED

08/31/2021:ORDER-ORDER FROM 5TH DCA-MOTION TO RELINQUISH JURISDICTION IS GRANTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

08/16/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

08/02/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL

07/23/2021:AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE NUMBER- 21-1718

07/13/2021:ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE NUMBER- 21-1718

MOTION TO VACATE JUDICAIAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

07/12/2021:MOTION TO VACATE JUDICAIAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

INVOICE-APPELLATE FEES

07/12/2021:INVOICE-APPELLATE FEES

NOTICE OF APPEAL

07/12/2021:NOTICE OF APPEAL

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

06/28/2021:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

ANSWER/RESPONSE-ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE NOTICE TO THIS COURT OF TENDER OF PAYMENT AND MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

06/24/2021:ANSWER/RESPONSE-ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE NOTICE TO THIS COURT OF TENDER OF PAYMENT AND MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

ANSWER/RESPONSE-ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND DEFTS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF SUIT WITH PREJUDICE BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

06/24/2021:ANSWER/RESPONSE-ANSWER AND OBJECTION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AND DEFTS MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF SUIT WITH PREJUDICE BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVERS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE AMENDED TO DEFT VIVIAN SINCLAIR COVER MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO PLTFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT VIVIAN S COVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO RESPOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCompliance INVOICE has been created with due date of 10/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVOICE-APPELLATE FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $52.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER-ORDER FROM 5TH DCA-MOTION TO RELINQUISH JURISDICTION IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number XX 603680

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000191CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/1/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less