This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 19:02:38 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Et Al VS REVILLA, MICHAEL ANGELO

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against REVILLA, MICHAEL ANGELO. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JERALD, R GREGG and JERALD, R. GREG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JERALD, R GREGG

JERALD, R. GREG

 

Party Details

Petitioners

LORENZO, MARIA ELOSIA

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Respondent

REVILLA, MICHAEL ANGELO

Not Classified By Court

REVILLA, MICHAEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHNEIDER, PAMELA A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ELECTRONIC HEARING ON NOV 24 2020 AT 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED UPON RESPONDENT ON OCT 1 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: JERALD , R GREGG Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS -DOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY COURT COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR003072DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUPPORT AND OTHER RELIEF -DOR

    Read MoreRead Less