This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/19/2019 at 22:32:52 (UTC).

DENHAM, LAWRENCE VS REGIONAL TERMITE & PEST CONTRO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 DENHAM, LAWRENCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REGIONAL TERMITE PEST CONTRO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENHAM, LAWRENCE

Defendant

REGIONAL TERMITE & PEST CONTRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARDILLO, PETER M

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, JOSHUA SCOTT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/01/2020:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

MEDIATION REPORT

05/19/2020:MEDIATION REPORT

AGREED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME CONT SEE DOC

06/18/2020:AGREED ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME CONT SEE DOC

ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

06/22/2020:ANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

MOTION-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

06/15/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT REGIONAL TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL INC

05/28/2020:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY DEFT REGIONAL TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL INC

ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

04/28/2020:ORDER ON DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

08/25/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION FILED BY PLTF LAWRENCE DENHAM

NOTICE-OF DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF DATA

09/25/2019:NOTICE-OF DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF DATA

ORDER TO TRANSFER-VENUE

09/25/2019:ORDER TO TRANSFER-VENUE

MOTION TO DISMISS-OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, FILED BY DEFT

09/25/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS-OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE, FILED BY DEFT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE-FILED BY PLTF

09/25/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE-FILED BY PLTF

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES -FILED BY PLTF

09/25/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES -FILED BY PLTF

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/25/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST-FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

09/25/2019:REQUEST-FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

CERTIFICATE-OF AUTHORITY

09/25/2019:CERTIFICATE-OF AUTHORITY

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/25/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE -REGARDING MARION COUNTY CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 470543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Case 422019CA002191CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST-FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE-OF AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE-OF DEMAND FOR PRESERVATION OF DATA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST-FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO TRANSFER-CERTIFIED COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH , JOSHUA SCOTT