This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/12/2019 at 21:34:52 (UTC).

DAWICKI, MARY VS SIGMON, JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 DAWICKI, MARY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIGMON, JAMES. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAWICKI, MARY

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

SIGMON, JAMES

SIGMON, RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUTARELLI, RICHARD DAVID

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/03/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

ORDER

04/02/2019:ORDER

JUDGES WORKSHEET

04/01/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

04/01/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/25/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS RICHARD SIGMON AND JAMES SIGMON

03/22/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS RICHARD SIGMON AND JAMES SIGMON

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES SIGMON

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES SIGMON

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHARD SIGMON

03/20/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHARD SIGMON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/20/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/19/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/19/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/19/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/19/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS RICHARD SIGMON AND JAMES SIGMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANTS IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JAMES SIGMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHARD SIGMON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 03/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $215.00 Receipt Number XX 412674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $215.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case 422019SC001307SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less