This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 09/23/2021 at 12:23:44 (UTC).

DAVID, HAYES Et Al VS ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 DAVID, HAYES filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD LEON and SANDERS, GARY LAMAR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVID, HAYES

LEE, EARL

Defendants

ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION

CLAY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE INC

HAYES, CHARLES V

HAYES, CHARLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER ALLAN

Defendant Attorney

HASWELL, JOHN HARRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISCHARGE NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLTFS DAVID HAYES AND EARL LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCLAY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE INC dismissed 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF DAVID HAYES AND EARL LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY CHARLES HAYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE-RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT CHARLES HAYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE EFILED NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 636660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA000864CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLAY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON, CHRISTOPHER ALLAN