This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/15/2021 at 21:43:33 (UTC).

DAMPLER, MATTHEW VS MARS COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 DAMPLER, MATTHEW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARS COMPANY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS, SARAH, WILLIAMS, SARAH RITTERHOFF and SARAH RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS, SARAH

WILLIAMS, SARAH RITTERHOFF

SARAH RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAMPLER, MATTHEW

Defendants

PETERSON, MICHAEL

MARS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TENENBAUM, JASON

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/21/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/21/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

04/21/2021:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/21/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/21/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 06/08/2021 16:00; Judge: RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS, SARAH; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 630640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 06/08/2021 at 0400 PM - Judge SARAH RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $175.00 Receipt Number XX 630552

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase 422021SC001738SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARS, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tenenbaum, Jason, ESQ