This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 09/23/2021 at 14:25:12 (UTC).

COOPER, HOWARD JR VS ALLEN, MARILYN Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 COOPER, HOWARD JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALLEN, MARILYN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD LEON, SCOTT, EDWARD L, SANDERS, GARY L and SANDERS, GARY LAMAR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SANDERS, GARY L

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOPER, HOWARD JR

Defendants

ALLEN, MARILYN

BURCHAM, JESSICA

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE

Not Classified By Court

A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GLENZ, THOMAS PATRICK

LITTLE, BRETT BARRY

FRANZOI, CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FROM DEFTS FILED BY PLTF HOWARD

09/02/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FROM DEFTS FILED BY PLTF HOWARD

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

08/18/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

08/18/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

08/18/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

08/17/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

08/03/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

08/03/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

08/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

08/03/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

08/03/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS JESSICA BURCHAM and MARILYN ALLEN

07/28/2021:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS JESSICA BURCHAM and MARILYN ALLEN

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/29/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

06/29/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/29/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/29/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FROM DEFTS FILED BY PLTF HOWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DIGITAL DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY JESSICA BURCHAM AND MARILYN ALLEN

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001206CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS P GLENZ, ESQ