This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/02/2019 at 22:32:21 (UTC).

COOK, JONATHON Et Al VS E-ONE INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 COOK, JONATHON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against E-ONE INC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COOK, JONATHON

COOK, TABATHA

Defendants

E-ONE INC

HAMILTON, TIMOTHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINCKLEY, CHRISTOPHER JASON

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, KEVIN SCOTT

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/30/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/29/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/29/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

10/29/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/09/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/09/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

10/09/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/09/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/09/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/09/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS E ONE INC AND TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT TIMOTHY HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 472576

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case 422019CA002235CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less