This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/30/2019 at 21:31:54 (UTC).

COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS COR VS LEWIS, TAMERA

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS COR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LEWIS, TAMERA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS COR

Defendant

LEWIS, TAMERA

Not Classified By Court

DBA PARKSIDE GARDENS APARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSE, CHARLES KENNETH

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/26/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

JUDGES WORKSHEET

06/24/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

06/24/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

06/19/2019:AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

06/19/2019:MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

06/19/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

06/18/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

06/18/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

06/17/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

06/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

06/06/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/06/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Payment received: $332.69 Receipt Number XX 440429

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $9.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $323.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF COMMUNITY HOUSING PARTNERS CORPORATION OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT TAMERA LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Active Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 436844

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Case 422019SC002794SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/6/2019

    Read MoreRead Less