This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/14/2020 at 21:34:37 (UTC).

CLOINGER, BRENNAN MICHAEL VS CLOINGER, JENNIFER MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/12/2020 CLOINGER, BRENNAN MICHAEL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CLOINGER, JENNIFER MARIE. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BASS, JENNIFER LESTER and BASS, JENNIFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BASS, JENNIFER LESTER

BASS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLOINGER, BRENNAN MICHAEL

Respondent

CLOINGER, JENNIFER MARIE

Not Classified By Court

SMITH, JENNIFER M

CLOINGER, JENNIFER

SMITH, JENNIFER MARIE

CLOINGER, SKYLER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCLS: JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING BY ELECTRONIC MEANS ONLY ON 06.25.20 AT 11:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON JUNE 25, 2020 AT 11:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY ORDER NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER (ACTIONS INVOLVING PARENTING ISSUES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMOTION- TO SET FINAL HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCOMPLETION CERTIFICATE- JENNIFER CLOINGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCOMPLETION CERTIFICATE- BRENNAN CLOINGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DISSSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: BASS , JENNIFER Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $408.00 Receipt Number XX 518818

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR000967DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/12/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less