This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/15/2019 at 21:32:26 (UTC).

CLARK, SHARON Et Al VS DOMM, STEVEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 CLARK, SHARON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DOMM, STEVEN. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLARK, SHARON

WIECHENS, EUGENE A

Defendants

DOMM, STEVEN

PENNA, MICHAEL

Not Classified By Court

AS TRUSTEE OF THE VIRGINA N AD

WIECHENS AS TRUSTEE, EUGENE A.

AKA MICAHEL ANDREW PENNA,

AS TRUSTEE OF THE ROSELLA M WI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIECHENS, EUGENE A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

06/05/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL PENNA

06/03/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL PENNA

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT STEVEN DOMM

06/03/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT STEVEN DOMM

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL PENNA

05/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL PENNA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN DOMM

05/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN DOMM

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

05/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/23/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

05/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

05/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL PENNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT STEVEN DOMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR MICHAEL PENNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEVEN DOMM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 432745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Case 422019SC002644SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less